Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Maria da Silva Ferrão de Carvalho Mártens

Deceased

Bishop of Portalegre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1815BornLisboa
25 May 183924.1Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jan 187559.8SelectedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
16 Feb 187559.9ConfirmedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
6 Jun 187560.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
12 Jul 188368.3SelectedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
9 Aug 188368.3ConfirmedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
13 Jul 188469.3InstalledBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
20 Nov 188469.6DiedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José Maria da Silva Ferrão de Carvalho Mártens:
Bishop José Maria da Silva Ferrão de Carvalho Mártens (born , died ) Bishop of Portalegre

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,097
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 157, and Page 463

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013