Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Botelho de Matos

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of São Salvador da Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1678³BornLisboa, Portugal
30 Jul 171334.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Aug 171334.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 173960.2SelectedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
2 Jan 174162.1ConfirmedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
5 Feb 174162.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
31 Jan 175980.2RetiredArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
22 Nov 176789.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Botelho de Matos:
Archbishop José Botelho de Matos (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of São Salvador da Bahia

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 364

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015