Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel da Anunciação (da Cunha), O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1703Born
26 May 172926.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
22 Jun 172926.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
22 Feb 173936.0SelectedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
19 Dec 174037.8ConfirmedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
9 Apr 174138.1Ordained BishopBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
29 Aug 177976.5DiedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Miguel da Anunciação (da Cunha)
Bishop Miguel da Anunciação (da Cunha) O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Coimbra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 172
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,741, Number 22
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 15, Number 836

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast