Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Vitalino Fernandes Dantas, O. Carm.

Bishop of Beja


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1941 BornBarros de Vila Verde
3 Aug 196826.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
3 Jul 199654.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
3 Jul 199654.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tlos
29 Sep 199654.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tlos
25 Jan 199957.2AppointedBishop of Beja, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António Vitalino Fernandes Dantas:
Bishop António Vitalino Fernandes Dantas O. Carm. (born ) Bishop of Beja

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Beja.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,850
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013