Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Rebello Cardoso de Menezes

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Lamego

Titular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1832BornVilla Real
19 Sep 185724.9Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 188452.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
13 Nov 188452.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
7 Dec 188452.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
14 Mar 188754.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lamego, Portugal
14 Mar 188754.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
1890¹57.2DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Lamego, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Rebello Cardoso de Menezes:
Archbishop Giovanni Rebello Cardoso de Menezes (born ) Coadjutor Bishop of Lamego

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 331, and Page 334
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 388

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013