Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop St. Bartolomé Fernandes dos Mártires, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Braga, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1514Born
11 Nov 152814.5EnteredMember of Order of Friars Preachers
20 Nov 152915.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
29 Jan 155944.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
3 Sep 155945.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
4 Oct 155945.4InstalledArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
23 Feb 158267.8ResignedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
16 Jul 159076.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Braga, Portugal
4 Nov 2001Beatified
5 Jul 2019Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Bartolomé Fernandes dos Mártires (VIAF: 52492049)
Archbishop St. Bartolomé Fernandes dos Mártires O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Braga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerdela, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained BishopS. Domingo, Convent, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Death PlaceViana do Castelo

  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,459
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,671
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,559, Number 7
  • prof: CB, 23 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast