Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joćo Manuel, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guarda


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Apr 1442AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
20 Jul 1444AppointedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
27 Sep 1444Ordained BishopBishop of Ceuta, Spain
9 Jul 1459AppointedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
1476²DiedBishop of Guarda, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joćo Manuel:
Bishop Joćo Manuel O. Carm. Bishop of Guarda

  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 250, and Page 125
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 149
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,753

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013