Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aleixo de Miranda Henriques, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Porto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1692BornLisboa
15 Oct 175765.1SelectedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
13 Mar 175865.5ConfirmedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
24 Aug 175866.0Ordained BishopBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
5 Mar 177077.5SelectedBishop of Porto, Portugal
6 Aug 177077.9ConfirmedBishop of Porto, Portugal
13 May 177178.7DiedBishop of Porto, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Aleixo de Miranda Henriques:
Bishop Aleixo de Miranda Henriques O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Porto

  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1758, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 291, and Page 346

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Nov 2015