Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Eusebio Luciano Carvalho Gomes da Silva, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Nanking [Nanjing], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1763Born
11 Jul 178925.5SelectedBishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China
14 Dec 178926.0ConfirmedBishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China
30 Mar 179026.3DiedBishop-Elect of Nanking [Nanjing], China

MicroData Summary for Eusebio Luciano Carvalho Gomes da Silva
Father Eusebio Luciano Carvalho Gomes da Silva C.M. (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Nanking [Nanjing]

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaparia, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 301

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast