Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manoel da Ressurreição, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1718³BornLisboa, Portugal
1 May 174022.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
25 Feb 174123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
21 Mar 177153.1SelectedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
17 Jun 177153.4ConfirmedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
28 Oct 177153.8Ordained BishopBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
21 Oct 178971.7DiedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manoel da Ressurreição:
Bishop Manoel da Ressurreição O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of São Paulo

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 331

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Dec 2015