Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lourenço de Lencastre

Deceased

Bishop of Leiria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1716BornLisboa
28 May 175942.8AppointedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
14 Oct 175943.2Ordained BishopBishop of Elvas, Portugal
20 Jun 178063.9SelectedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
18 Sep 178064.1ConfirmedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
4 Mar 179073.6DiedBishop of Leiria, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Lourenço de Lencastre:
Bishop Lourenço de Lencastre (born , died ) Bishop of Leiria

  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 207, and Page 257
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1790
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015