Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emanuele Trindade Salgueiro

Deceased

Archbishop of Évora, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1898Born
19 Feb 192122.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Nov 194042.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
23 Nov 194042.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Palaestina
24 Feb 194142.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Palaestina
14 Mar 194950.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
20 May 195556.6AppointedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
20 Sep 196566.9DiedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Emanuele Trindade Salgueiro
Archbishop Emanuele Trindade Salgueiro (born , died ) Archbishop of Évora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIlhuvensi

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast