Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Alvarez de Acosta

Deceased

Bishop of Osma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1484²BornAlpedrina de Veros
12 Feb 150723.1AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
8 Jan 153551.0AppointedBishop of León, Spain
21 May 153955.3AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
20 Feb 156379.1DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Alvarez de Acosta:
Bishop Pedro Alvarez de Acosta (died ) Bishop of Osma

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 278, and Page 221
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 265
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 24, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015