Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Tomas da Silva Leitão e Castro

Deceased

Bishop of Lamego, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1848Born
25 May 187224.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 188335.0AppointedPrelate of Mozambico
8 May 188335.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
8 Dec 188335.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
27 Mar 188436.2AppointedBishop of Angola e Congo
1 Jun 189143.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lamego, Portugal
1 Jun 189143.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Echinus
19 Nov 189547.8SucceededBishop of Lamego, Portugal
3 Dec 190153.8DiedBishop of Lamego, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Antonio Tomas da Silva Leitão e Castro (VIAF: 91880703)
Bishop Antonio Tomas da Silva Leitão e Castro (born , died ) Bishop of Lamego

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained BishopS. Sacrament, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Death PlaceLamego, Diocese of Lamego

  • a priest for 29.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,901
  • b: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,100
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 104, and Page 256
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 331, and Page 355
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,883, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast