Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop JosÚ Maria de Santa Anna Noronha, O.S.P.P.E. †

Deceased

Bishop of Braganša e Miranda, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1761Born
1779²17.9ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit
11 Jan 178422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit
24 May 182463.3AppointedBishop of Braganša e Miranda, Portugal
1 Aug 182463.4Ordained BishopBishop of Braganša e Miranda, Portugal
26 May 182665.3AppointedBishop of Angra, Portugal
24 Dec 182968.8DiedBishop of Braganša e Miranda, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for JosÚ Maria de Santa Anna Noronha (VIAF: 7742616)
Bishop JosÚ Maria de Santa Anna Noronha O.S.P.P.E. (born , died ) Bishop of Braganša e Miranda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 118
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,824, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast