Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luiz de Santa Teresa da Cruz Salgado de Castilho, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Olinda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1692BornLisboa, Portugal
20 Jan 172431.8ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
19 Mar 172431.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Discalced Carmelites
25 Mar 172432.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
21 Jul 173846.3SelectedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
3 Sep 173846.4ConfirmedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
14 Dec 173846.7Ordained BishopBishop of Olinda, Brazil
17 Nov 175765.6DiedBishop of Olinda, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luiz de Santa Teresa da Cruz Salgado de Castilho:
Bishop Luiz de Santa Teresa da Cruz Salgado de Castilho O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Olinda

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 32
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 317

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015