Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Estevăo de la Garde

Deceased

Archbishop of Arles, France


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Dec 1344AppointedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
17 Mar 1348AppointedBishop of Saintes, France
8 Jan 1351AppointedArchbishop of Arles, France
19 May 1361DiedArchbishop of Arles, France

MicroData Summary for Estevăo de la Garde
Archbishop Estevăo de la Garde (died ) Archbishop of Arles

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 21 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.3, 16 Feb 2019; Data: 2 Mar 2019

Quantcast