Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Suarez de Sainte-Marie, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sées {Séez}, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Nov 1552³Born
9 Jan 161259.1AppointedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
4 Mar 161259.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
30 May 161461.5DiedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques Suarez de Sainte-Marie
Bishop Jacques Suarez de Sainte-Marie O.F.M. (born Nov 1552, died ) Bishop of Sées {Séez}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisbon, Portugal

  • a bishop for 2.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: La France Pontificale, Volume 14, Page 59
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 299
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1612, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast