Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Évora

Archidioecesis Eborensis (Elborensis)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 24 September 1540
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Portugal
  • Square Kilometers: 13,547 (5,232 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocese-evora.pt/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Arquiepiscopal, Largo Marques de Marialva 6, 7000-809 Evora, Portugal
  • Telephone: 266.748.864
  • Fax: 266.748.851

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Évora
4th CenturyErectedDiocese of Évora (erected)
Archdiocese of Évora
24 September 1540ElevatedDiocese of Évora Archdiocese of Évora
2 April 1550Territory LostArchdiocese of Évora
Diocese of Guarda
Diocese of Portalegre (erected)
10 July 1770Territory LostArchdiocese of Évora Diocese of Beja (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Évora
1970349,071364,28295.8%134271612,16845317166ap1971
1980305,000323,00094.4%108311392,19458318166ap1981
1990278,000294,00094.6%94201142,43830311162ap1991
1999246,325290,40084.8%82291112,2191042257161ap2000
2000246,325290,40084.8%84321162,1231045250158ap2001
2001246,325290,40084.8%87321192,0691045253158ap2002
2002246,325290,40084.8%79301092,2591050239158ap2003
2003246,325290,40084.8%84301142,1601041227158ap2004
2004246,325290,40084.8%77301072,3021041220158ap2005
2006245,900290,00084.8%77261032,3871051191158ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 Aug 2014