Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joaquim Xavier Botelho de Lima

Deceased

Archbishop of Évora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1717³BornLisboa
6 Jan 174224.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 178366.7AppointedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
14 Mar 178466.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
10 Apr 180083.0DiedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joaquim Xavier Botelho de Lima:
Archbishop Joaquim Xavier Botelho de Lima (born , died ) Archbishop of Évora

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 206
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,078
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016