Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Joćo Duarte do Sacramento, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Olinda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1630BornLisbon
7 Jun 165928.7Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
10 Sep 168554.9AppointedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
10 Jan 168655.3DiedBishop-Elect of Olinda, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Joćo Duarte do Sacramento:
Priest Joćo Duarte do Sacramento C.O. (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Olinda

  • a priest for 26.6 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013