Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Laynez, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Tomé of Meliapore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1663¹BornLisboa
7 Nov 170744.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
7 Nov 170744.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Pisidia
18 Mar 170845.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Pisidia
24 Nov 170845.8SucceededBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
11 Jun 171552.4DiedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Laynez:
Bishop Francisco Laynez S.J. (born 1663, died ) Bishop of São Tomé of Meliapore

  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 361, and Page 379
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,578
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1708, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015