Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Pegado de Azevedo, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Angra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1750³BornLisboa
9 Aug 177828.4Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
20 Dec 180050.8SelectedBishop of Angra, Portugal
20 Jul 180151.4ConfirmedBishop of Angra, Portugal
15 Nov 180151.7Ordained BishopBishop of Angra, Portugal
19 Jun 181262.3DiedBishop of Angra, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Pegado de Azevedo:
Bishop José Pegado de Azevedo C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Angra

  • a priest for 33.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 76
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013