Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joćo Teixeira de Carvalho

Deceased

Bishop of Elvas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1721³BornLisboa
24 Sep 174625.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Dec 174625.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 178059.3SelectedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
18 Sep 178059.6ConfirmedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
22 Apr 179271.2DiedBishop of Elvas, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joćo Teixeira de Carvalho
Bishop Joćo Teixeira de Carvalho (born , died ) Bishop of Elvas

  • a priest for 45.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 207
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Feb 2016