Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio da Penha de França, O.A.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Tomé e Príncipe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1649³BornLisboa, Portugal
5 Oct 169949.9AppointedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
29 Jun 170050.6Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
1702¹52.1DiedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio da Penha de França:
Bishop Antonio da Penha de França O.A.D. (born , died 1702) Bishop of São Tomé e Príncipe

  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1700, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 378

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 May 2015