Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martinho da Costa

Deceased

Archbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1434²Born
28 Jun 150066.4AppointedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
28 Nov 152187.9DiedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martinho da Costa
Archbishop Martinho da Costa (born 1434, died ) Archbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlpedrinha

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 259
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 322
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,500, Number 22*
  • bp/bd: CB, 21 Feb 2019
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast