Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Batalha Henriques

Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Titular Bishop of Aquae Thibilitanae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1966 Born
1 Jul 199024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
13 Oct 201852.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
13 Oct 201852.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Thibilitanae
25 Nov 201852.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Thibilitanae

MicroData Summary for Daniel Batalha Henriques
Bishop Daniel Batalha Henriques (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSant’Isidoro, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained BishopJeronimos, Monastery, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Please contact the Bishop through the Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Oct 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 13 Oct 2018
  • c34: CB, 25 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 27 Nov 2018

Quantcast