Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Policarpo da Costa Vaz

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Guarda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1908BornBarreiros
21 Mar 193123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Viseu, Portugal
17 Apr 195042.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto, Portugal
17 Apr 195042.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro
29 Jun 195042.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro
1952²43.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
29 Jan 195445.9AppointedBishop of Macau, China
9 Jul 196052.3AppointedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
17 Nov 197971.7ResignedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
4 Jan 198475.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Guarda, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Policarpo da Costa Vaz:
Bishop Policarpo da Costa Vaz (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Guarda

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015