Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Miguel de Távora, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Évora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1683BornLisboa
16 Sep 170824.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
22 Sep 170824.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
22 Feb 173955.2SelectedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
19 Dec 174057.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
19 Feb 174157.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
16 Sep 175975.8DiedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Miguel de Távora:
Archbishop Miguel de Távora O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Évora

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 206
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,071
  • bd: CB, 21 Jul 2014
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 7 Jan 2016