Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fernando Cardinal de Sousa e Silva

Deceased

Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1712BornLisboa
20 Dec 173826.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
10 May 173926.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
1 Jun 177865.5Elevated to Cardinal
14 Aug 177865.7SelectedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
1 Mar 177966.2ConfirmedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
30 May 177966.5Ordained BishopPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
11 Apr 178673.3DiedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Fernando de Sousa e Silva:
Fernando Cardinal de Sousa e Silva (born , died ) Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
  • a cardinal for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jun 1778
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015