Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Caetano da Silva Coutinho

Deceased

Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1768BornCaldas de Rainha, Portugal
23 Feb 179325.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jan 180637.9SelectedBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
26 Aug 180638.5ConfirmedBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
15 Mar 180739.1Ordained BishopBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
27 Jan 183365.0DiedBishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Caetano da Silva Coutinho:
Bishop José Caetano da Silva Coutinho (born , died ) Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 338

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013