Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nuno Brás da Silva Martins

Bishop of Funchal, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1963 Born
4 Jul 198724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
10 Oct 201148.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
10 Oct 201148.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Elvas
20 Nov 201148.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elvas
12 Jan 201955.6AppointedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
17 Feb 201955.7InstalledBishop of Funchal, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Nuno Brás da Silva Martins
Bishop Nuno Brás da Silva Martins (born ) Bishop of Funchal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVimeiro, Lourinhã
Ordained BishopJerónimos, Monastery, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Funchal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,182
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2019
  • i: CB, 12 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 13 Jan 2019

Quantcast