Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Telles da Silva, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Funchal, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1628¹Born
17 Dec 167446.9AppointedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
24 Mar 167547.2Ordained BishopBishop of Funchal, Portugal
14 Feb 168254.1DiedBishop of Funchal, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for António Telles da Silva
Bishop António Telles da Silva O.S.B. (born 1628, died ) Bishop of Funchal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 206
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,675, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast