Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jo„o Coutinho

Deceased

Archbishop of …vora


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Nov 1617AppointedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
18 Mar 1618Ordained BishopBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
9 Jan 1627SelectedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
14 Jun 1627ConfirmedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
3 Dec 1635AppointedArchbishop of …vora, Portugal
12 Sep 1643DiedArchbishop of …vora, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Jo„o Coutinho:
Archbishop Jo„o Coutinho (died ) Archbishop of …vora

  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 181, and Page 278
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 213
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1618, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 17 Feb 2015