Catholic-Hierarchy DC

José Sebastião (d’Almeida) Cardinal Neto, O.F.M. Disc. †

Deceased

Patriarch Emeritus of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1841Born
21 May 186423.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
1 Apr 186524.1Ordained PriestPriest of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
15 Aug 187534.5ProfessedPriest of Order of Discalced Friars Minor
30 Jul 187938.5SelectedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
22 Sep 187938.6ConfirmedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
18 Apr 188039.2Ordained BishopBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
12 Jul 188342.4SelectedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
9 Aug 188342.5ConfirmedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
24 Mar 188443.1Elevated to Cardinal
10 Jun 188645.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
7 Nov 190766.7ResignedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
7 Dec 192079.8DiedPatriarch Emeritus of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José Sebastião (d’Almeida) Neto
José Sebastião (d’Almeida) Cardinal Neto O.F.M. Disc. (born , died ) Patriarch Emeritus of Lisboa {Lisbon}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLagos, Diocese of Faro {Algarve}
Ordained BishopSão Julião, Church, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Death PlaceVillariño
Buried Place (Original)San Telmo Chapel, Crypt, Tui, Diocese of Tui, Spain
Buried Place (Current)Tomb of the Patriarchs, São Vicente de Fora, Church, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
  • a cardinal for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,099
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 104, and Page 346
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 46
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Mar 1884
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Apr 2017