Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jorge de Almeida

Deceased

Archbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1531²Born
14 Nov 156938.8AppointedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
20 Mar 158554.2DiedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jorge de Almeida (VIAF: 99362873)
Archbishop Jorge de Almeida (born 1531, died ) Archbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 322
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Number 74*
  • bp: CB, 21 Feb 2019
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast