Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Antonio de Lencastre, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Leiria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1621BornLisboa
26 Apr 167756.1AppointedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
25 Jul 167756.3Ordained BishopBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
2 Jun 168160.2AppointedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
19 Jul 169473.3ResignedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
Sep 1706³85.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Leiria, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Antonio de Lencastre:
Bishop José Antonio de Lencastre O. Carm. (born , died Sep 1706) Bishop Emeritus of Leiria

  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 241, and Page 270
  • ob/c2+: CB, 28 Nov 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 9 May 2015