Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel da Cunha

Deceased

Bishop of Elvas


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Jun 1638AppointedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
2 Oct 1646SelectedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
30 Nov 1658DiedBishop of Elvas, Portugal

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Manuel da Cunha:
Bishop Manuel da Cunha (died ) Bishop of Elvas

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 182
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1638, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015