Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop João Cardoso Castelo

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Titular Archbishop of Lacedaemonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1673³BornLoures
19 Mar 169623.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Dec 171845.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
5 Dec 171845.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Lacedaemonia
19 Mar 171946.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Lacedaemonia
19 Dec 174067.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for João Cardoso Castelo
Archbishop João Cardoso Castelo (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 234
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,068
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 22 Jun 2016