Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Francisco Sanches Alves

Archbishop of Évora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1941 BornLageosa da Raia
3 Jul 196625.2Ordained PriestPriest of Évora, Portugal
7 Mar 199856.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
7 Mar 199856.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierpiniana
31 May 199857.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierpiniana
22 Apr 200463.0AppointedBishop of Portalegre-Castelo Branco, Portugal
8 Jan 200866.7AppointedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José Francisco Sanches Alves:
Archbishop José Francisco Sanches Alves (born ) Archbishop of Évora

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Évora.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,330

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 23 Nov 2014