Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostinho Ribeiro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lamego, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Sep 1534AppointedBishop of Angra, Portugal
24 Sep 1540AppointedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
1551¹ResignedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
27 Mar 1563DiedBishop Emeritus of Lamego, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostinho Ribeiro
Bishop Agostinho Ribeiro (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lamego

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 217, and Page 110
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1534, Number 19*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast