Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Afonso Nogueira, C.R.S.J.E. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1399²Born
15 Nov 145253.8AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
24 Dec 145960.9AppointedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Oct 1464³65.7DiedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Afonso Nogueira
Archbishop Afonso Nogueira C.R.S.J.E. (born 1399, died Oct 1464) Archbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 259, and Page 132
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,452, Number 33*
  • bd: CB, 21 Feb 2019
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast