Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guilherme Cardinal Henriques de Carvalho

Deceased

Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Apostolic Administrator of Castelo Branco

Apostolic Administrator of Portalegre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1793BornCoimbra
5 Jun 181926.3Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 184249.9SelectedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
3 Apr 184350.2ConfirmedBishop of Leiria, Portugal
2 Jul 184350.4Ordained BishopBishop of Leiria, Portugal
12 Jun 184552.4SelectedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
24 Nov 184552.8ConfirmedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
184652.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Portalegre, Portugal
184652.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Castelo Branco, Portugal
19 Jan 184653.0Elevated to Cardinal
15 Nov 185764.8DiedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Guilherme Henriques de Carvalho:
Cardinal Guilherme Henriques de Carvalho (born , died ) Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
  • a cardinal for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 234, and Page 242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013