Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando de Faro

Deceased

Bishop of Elvas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1668³BornLisboa
24 Aug 170739.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Aug 170739.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 May 171446.0AppointedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
10 Jul 171446.1Ordained BishopBishop of Elvas, Portugal
14 Oct 171446.4DiedBishop of Elvas, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando de Faro:
Bishop Fernando de Faro (born , died ) Bishop of Elvas

  • a priest for 7.1 years
  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,211
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 195

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015