Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Júlio Tavares Rebimbas

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Porto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1922BornBunheiro
29 Jun 194523.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 196543.6AppointedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
26 Dec 196543.9Ordained BishopBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
1 Jul 197250.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
1 Jul 197250.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
3 Nov 197755.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Viana do Castelo, Portugal
12 Feb 198260.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Porto, Portugal
13 Jun 199775.3RetiredBishop of Porto, Portugal
6 Dec 201088.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Porto, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Júlio Tavares Rebimbas:
Archbishop Júlio Tavares Rebimbas (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Porto

  • a priest for 65.4 years
  • a bishop for 44.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015