Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João da Silva Campos Neves

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lamego, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1889Born
23 Dec 191122.3Ordained PriestPriest
27 May 193141.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
27 May 193141.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Vatarba
25 Jul 193141.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vatarba
29 Oct 194859.2AppointedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
2 Feb 197181.5RetiredBishop of Lamego, Portugal
2 Mar 198090.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Lamego, Portugal

MicroData Summary for João da Silva Campos Neves
Bishop João da Silva Campos Neves (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lamego

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCêpos

  • a priest for 68.1 years
  • a bishop for 48.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast