Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo Osório

Deceased

Bishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1506¹Born
21 Jun 156458.4AppointedBishop of Silves (Sylves), Portugal
22 Oct 156458.8Ordained BishopBishop of Silves (Sylves), Portugal
20 Aug 158074.6DiedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo Osório (VIAF: 71374573)
Bishop Jerónimo Osório (born 1506, died ) Bishop of Faro {Algarve}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Maria da Graça, Convent, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 300
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,460
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1564, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast