Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Afonso Furtado de Mendonça

Deceased

Archbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1561BornNouveau Mont Majeur
9 Dec 160948.9AppointedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
28 Feb 161049.1Ordained BishopBishop of Guarda, Portugal
5 Sep 161655.6AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
12 Nov 161857.8AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
2 Dec 162665.9AppointedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
2 Jun 163069.4DiedArchbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Afonso Furtado de Mendonça:
Archbishop Afonso Furtado de Mendonça (died ) Archbishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,836
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 180, and Page 120
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 155
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1610, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Feb 2015