Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaspar de Bragança

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1716Born
15 Oct 175741.0SelectedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
13 Mar 175841.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
25 Jul 175841.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
18 Jan 178972.2DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Gaspar de Bragança
Archbishop Gaspar de Bragança (born , died ) Archbishop of Braga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,758, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast