Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Lima (Lemos), O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Olinda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630BornLisboa, Portugal
25 Sep 165020.7ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
19 Dec 169162.0AppointedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
20 Apr 169262.3Ordained BishopBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
22 Aug 169565.6AppointedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
29 Apr 170474.3DiedBishop of Olinda, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Lima (Lemos):
Bishop Francisco de Lima (Lemos) O. Carm. (died ) Bishop of Olinda

  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013